This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:24:47 (UTC).

AGI Publishing Inc. vs. AT&T

Case Summary

On 03/05/2014 AGI Publishing Inc filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against AT T. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Cullers, Mark, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0656

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Cullers, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGI Publishing, Inc.

Valley Yellow Pages

Defendants

AT&T, Inc.

Cerberus Capital Management, LP

YP Holdings, LLC

Deal, Daniel

Kliment, Richard

Hevesy, Christopher

Cerberus Capital Mangement (California) LLC.

YP, LLC

Cerberus Operations and Advisory Company, LLC

YP Western Directory, LLC

Yellowpages.Com, LLC

YP Advertising, LP

YP Western Holdings LLC

AT&T Corp. sued as Doe 1

Print Media LLC

YP Advertising and Publishing LLC

Not Yet Classified

Quinn, Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alldredge, Ralph C.

Law Offices Of Ralph Alldredge P. O. Box 866

San Andres, CA 95249

Fischbach, Donald R.

Defendant Attorneys

O'Brien, Kevin J.

Sheehy, Maureen

Kiernan, David C

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Demurrer, Motion Strike

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order Retaining Jurisdiction and Dismissing Action with Prejudice - Granted

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: Letter Received directing the Court to shred all documents filed by either Plaintiff or Defenants continionnally under sealed but that were not ultimately sealed by court order. Letter forwarded to Supervisor CC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: re: Plaintiff's motin to compel and declaration

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of (Check# 166055 NTE $1,000.00)

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: [proposed] Order Granting Defendants Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission and Interrogatories

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Appearance of Dylan I. Ballard

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: In Support of Defendants Motion to File Under Seal

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of telephonic appearance

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: re: Sealing of Records Hearing (x2)

ADR Report - Case Not Resolved filed

2017-09-20 ADR Status Report.pdf; Comment: ADR Report - Case Not Resolved filed

Notice Filed

Notice of Lodging.pdf; Comment: NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS WITH THE COURT CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO RULE 2.551(b)(3)

Proof of Service

2017-07-13 POS re Opposition.pdf; Comment: Proof of Service

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry???of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of telephonic appearance

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of telephonic appearance

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: File Under Seal (California Rule of Court, Rule 2.550 et seq)

352 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: AGI Publishing, Inc.; YP, LLC; Yellowpages.Com, LLC; YP Western Directory, LLC; YP Advertising, LP; YP Western Holdings LLC; YP Advertising and Publishing LLC; Print Media LLC; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (See 1/17/18 scan order.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: amendment to protective order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- 2018-02-09 Amend. to PO.pdf; Comment: Stipulated Amendment to Protective Order signed and issued. Fowarded to clerks office 02/22/2018, for further processing. PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 402 Order for: Stipulated Amendement to Protective Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order Retaining Jurisdiction and Dismissing Action with Prejudice - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter Received- Notice; Comment: Letter to Clerk re Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter Received- Letter Received; Comment: Letter Received directing the Court to shred all documents filed by either Plaintiff or Defenants continionnally under sealed but that were not ultimately sealed by court order. Letter forwarded to Supervisor CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • List filed- Letter to Clerk; Comment: Letter to Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
809 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2015
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # 198927 AGI Publishing, Inc. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # 191869 AGI Publishing, Inc. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # 190215 AGI Publishing, Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # 187694 AGI Publishing, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Financial: AGI Publishing, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $2,235.00; Total Payments and Credits $2,235.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

:KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTONLLP MAUREEN A. SHEEHY (SBN 129859) KEVINJ. O’ BRIEN {SBN 278823).

Two Embarcadero Center; 8th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

‘TeIephone (413) 576-0200-

Facsimile:. (415)576-0300 ‘mshechv@kilpatrickiownsend. com

k{}bflm{f‘kfl atricktownsend.com

JAMES F: BOGAN, III (admiitted pro hacvice) WILLIAM D. MBYER ‘(admitted pro hac vice) Suite 2800 ‘1100 Peaclitree.Street NE | Atlanta, GA 30309-4528 USA 'Telephone (404) 815 6500 Facsimile: (404).815 6555. ibogan@kilpatricktownsend.com bmeveri@kilpatricktownsend.com

MCCORMICK BARSTOW, LLP D. GREG DURBIN (SBN 81749) 7647 North Fresno Street; 'P.0..Box.28912 | : Fresno, CA 93729-8912: Telephone: (559)433-1300. Facsimile: (559) 433-2300: Gree, Durbin@mecormickbarstow.com

Attomeys for Defendants YP WESTERN DIRECTORY, LLC YELLOWPAGES.COM,; LLC,‘:- YP LLC; YP-ADVERTISING, LP; YP WESTERN H.LD]NGS LLC

The Coutt, having read and considered the STIPULATION RE TIME TO FILE SECONDAMENDED COMPLAINT filed by the parties:in the above-referenced matter; and | go_o_d.c_ause,appe&ring-_flierefbr,._ |

HEREBY ORDERS'AS FOLLOWS: »

That: Plaintff AGI PUBLIISHING, INC. dba VALLEY YELLOW PAGES shall be given 30 days leave. to -amend to. file a 'Sficond'.Am¢néed Complaint; rather than 10 :days.as | reflected in the Court’s fentative ruling.

© @ Nt R W N

X/ ‘,‘

By ‘/l /|

JINT TN Lo j)/ W SUPERIOR. GOURT