This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 05:20:41 (UTC).

AGI Publishing, Inc. dba Valley Yellow pages vs. Black Diamond Asphalt CO., A Partnership

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 AGI Publishing, Inc dba Valley Yellow pages filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Black Diamond Asphalt CO , A Partnership. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Pebet, Noelle and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6414

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Pebet, Noelle

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGI Publishing, Inc. dba Valley Yellow pages

Defendants

Black Diamond Asphalt CO., A Partnership

Jerry Lee Golobe, IND/Partner Of Black Diamond Asphalt CO.

Jesse Landeros Serrato, INC/Partner Of Black DEiamon Asphalt CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bemis, Gary A

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: AGI Publishing, Inc. dba Valley Yellow pages; Black Diamond Asphalt CO., A Partnership; Jerry Lee Golobe, IND/Partner Of Black Diamond Asphalt CO.; Jesse Landeros Serrato, INC/Partner Of Black DEiamon Asphalt CO.; Comment: With prejudice

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Hearing set for 7/10/19 at 3:30 pm in Dept. 402

Notice of Settlement filed

Notice; Comment: of Entire Case

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: RE: Collections Case Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Sent on: 1/18/2019

Proof of Service

Signed.LAC43013.pdf; Comment: Black Diamond Asphalt Co.

Proof of Service

pos.Signed.LAC43015.pdf; Comment: Jesse Landeros Serrato

Proof of Service

LAC29470BP.pdf; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Jerry Lee Golobe

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Jesse Landeros Serrato

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Black Diamond

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: AGI Publishing, Inc. dba Valley Yellow pages; Black Diamond Asphalt CO., A Partnership; Jerry Lee Golobe, IND/Partner Of Black Diamond Asphalt CO.; Jesse Landeros Serrato, INC/Partner Of Black DEiamon Asphalt CO.; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • OSC - 3.740 Collection Case Dispo- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:40 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Hearing set for 7/10/19 at 3:30 pm in Dept. 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Notice; Comment: of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause- Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: RE: Collections Case Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Sent on: 1/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Signed.LAC43013.pdf; Comment: Black Diamond Asphalt Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- pos.Signed.LAC43015.pdf; Comment: Jesse Landeros Serrato

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- LAC29470BP.pdf; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Jerry Lee Golobe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Jesse Landeros Serrato

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Black Diamond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc. dba Valley Yellow pages: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-42306 AGI Publishing, Inc. dba Valley Yellow pages $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Financial info for AGI Publishing, Inc. dba Valley Yellow pages: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Financial: AGI Publishing, Inc. dba Valley Yellow pages; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGI Publishing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEMIS, GARY A