Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 03:59:22 (UTC).

Adora Alohalani vs David Jackson Jr

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Adora Alohalani filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against David Jackson Jr. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly, Duncan, Ronda, Meehan, Kathleen A and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1368

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly

Duncan, Ronda

Meehan, Kathleen A

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Alohalani, Adora

Clovis, CA 93611

Defendant

Jackson Jr, David

Respondent

Jackson, David, JR

Minors

Jackson, Jayden

Jackson, Elijah

Jackson, Aurielle Diane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Miller, James L

Respondent Attorney

Jimenez, Miguel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: CONVERSION, JUDGE; Judgment Type: Final Judgment Dissolution/MSA; Party Names: Alohalani, Adora; Jackson, David, JR; Jackson, Jayden; Jackson, Elijah; Jackson, Aurielle Diane; Comment: (Marital status ends: 1/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • 2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Order after Hearing- Comment: 11/16/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Documents sent to- Comment: sent OAH to Dept 204 for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Order after Hearing- Comment: 08/16/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Documents sent to- Comment: sent OAH to Dept 204 for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep- Comment: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Copies of Judgment of Dissolution placed in runner box #1. Notice of Entry of Judgment sent via mail to each party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Judgment sent to FLEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Judge's return letter or note- Comment: Judgment documents. All documents placed in box #1.

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2013
  • Uniform custody juris- Comment: Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: 03-12-13 jmc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _X__ No ___ 03-12-13 jmc Event: Pet Disso Marr w/child-No Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Order Granting Waiver of Fees- Comment: Order signed Yes _X__ No ___ 03-12-13 jmc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. 03-12-13 jmc Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 12-MAR-2013 by JCOHAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Financial info for Jackson, David, JR: Counter Payment Receipt # 201984 Jackson, David, Jr $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Financial info for Jackson, David, JR: Counter Payment Receipt # 201992 Jackson, David, Jr $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Financial info for Jackson, David, JR: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Financial info for Jackson, David, JR: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Financial: Jackson, David, JR; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less