This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:23:01 (UTC).

Abram Abanyan vs Dianne Vereschagin/JU

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Abram Abanyan filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Dianne Vereschagin/JU. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2373

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abanyan, Abram

Fresno, CA 93711

Defendant

Vereschagin, Dianne

Mariposa, CA 95338

Others

Golden Country Home Interiors

Central Valley Blinds

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Returned mail-no address found- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment returned by Post Office, no new address found for Dianne Vereschadin Document and envelope placed in file. mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Returned mail-no address found- Comment: returned by Post Office, no new address found for . Document and envelope placed in file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment SC- Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 2/26/14 to all parties. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 26-FEB-2014 by CCARACAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Judgment for- Comment: Court orders judgment entered on 2/25/14. Defendant Dianne Vereschagin dba Golden Country Home Interiors shall pay plaintiff Abran Abanyan dba Central Valley Blinds $4,330.08 principal and $80.00 costs, total judgment $4,410.08 on plaintiff's claim. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Small Claims Minute Order- Comment: Temporary Judge: James Lambe Dept.: 97E Clerk: C. Caracas Reporter/Tape: 9/27/28 Nature of Hearing: Court Trial Appearing Parties Plaintiff: Abram Abanyan Defendant: np cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 25-FEB-2014 by CCARACAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 25-FEB-2014 by CCARACAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$65.00 was made on receipt SCCE67215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$65.00 was made on receipt SCCE67215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltf claim mailed cert mail- Comment: Plaintiff's claim mailed to Dianne Vereschagin on 12/16/13 by certified mail, return receipt requested. mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltfs claim and order filed- Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 02/06/14 at 08:45 in Dept # 97E mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Financial info for Vereschagin, Dianne: Counter Payment Receipt # 67668 Vereschagin, Dianne $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • Financial info for Vereschagin, Dianne: Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Vereschagin, Dianne: Counter Payment Receipt # 67215 Vereschagin, Dianne $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Vereschagin, Dianne: Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Vereschagin, Dianne; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less