Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/03/2018 at 11:22:09 (UTC).

AAM Property Management v Andrew Pearson/UD/DIS

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 AAM Property Management filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Andrew Pearson/UD/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2305

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

AAM Property Management

All Other Occupants

Defendant

Pearson, Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 06-JUN-2013 by CGU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • Dismissal Order - Delay Reduc.- Comment: Order for dismissal of entire action without prejudice for failure to comply with delay reduction rules signed by Judge D. Ikeda filed. cgd.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: S. Ruiz Reporter: 4:08:30 PM Nature of Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal. IT IS ORDERED Entire action dismissed on Court's own motion without prejudice . sr/cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 13-MAY-2013 by CGU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Minute order Judge Ikeda- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: M. Mendoza Reporter: 1:59:01 Nature of Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal. Continued to 6/3/13 at 1:30 pm in Dept. 401 for same. mm/cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Dismissal not entered- Comment: Request for dismissal of does 1-10 filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: previously dismissed on 03-22-13. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Request enter default denied- Comment: Request for entry of default filed. Default not entered as requested for the following reason: Address on Three Day Notice and Plaintiff's Name does not match the Plaintiff's Name and Address on the Complaint. Proof of service for all Occpants is defective. Clerk's judgment not entered. ***Copies and unprocess judgments placed n Tickler under "A"*** lc

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2013
  • Proof of service-summon def.- Comment: Proof of service of summons on All Unknown Occupants filed showing defective service on 03/16/13- Posting is required for all Unknown Occupants. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Andrew Pearson on 03/06/13. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from GUAGMNU on 13-MAR-2013 by JLEYVA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE301195.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 12-MAR-2013 by LVANG.

    Read MoreRead Less