This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 08:00:41 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. vs. Hector Covarrubias Ramirez

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 A-L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hector Covarrubias Ramirez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gamoian, Lisa and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2317

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gamoian, Lisa

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp.

Defendant

Covarrubias Ramirez, Hector L.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; A-L Financial Corp.; Awarded Against:; Covarrubias Ramirez, Hector L.; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $2590.00; Party Names: A-L Financial Corp.; Covarrubias Ramirez, Hector L.

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Jose Sanchez

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Application and Order for Examination

Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,622.89

Acknowledgement of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment filed

Acknowledgement of Partial Satisfaction of Judgmen; Comment: $ 100.00

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $100.00 Interest: $ 107.89

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Christina Pena, Receptionist

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; A-L Financial Corp.; Awarded Against:; Covarrubias Ramirez, Hector L.; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $2590.00; Party Names: A-L Financial Corp.; Covarrubias Ramirez, Hector L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Jose Sanchez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Order of Examination- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Other- Comment: OX-Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Examination- Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,622.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgement of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment filed- Acknowledgement of Partial Satisfaction of Judgmen; Comment: $ 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $100.00 Interest: $ 107.89

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 10/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Financial info for A-L Financial Corp.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00018390 A-L Financial Corp. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Financial info for A-L Financial Corp.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Financial info for A-L Financial Corp.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00013009 A-L Financial Corp. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Financial info for A-L Financial Corp.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for A-L Financial Corp.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00034268 A-L Financial Corp. $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for A-L Financial Corp.: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial: A-L Financial Corp.; Total Financial Assessment $185.00; Total Payments and Credits $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.