This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 17:22:43 (UTC).

A. C., a minor vs. Central Unified School District

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 A C , a minor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Central Unified School District. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4076

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C., A.

Defendants

McDonald, Cierrah Ariah

Buffin, James

Greeley, D'Andre

Murray, Jacoby Lynn

Central Unified School District

Doe 1

Greeley, Phoebe

Greeley, Adrian

Roddy, Monica

Burg, Shante

Doe 2

Doe 21

Doe 11

Roddy, Darren

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paboojian, Warren R.

Defendant Attorney

Jeffcoach, Mandy L.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Of Kevin B. Kalajian in support of application for order allowing Doe Amendment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - JACOBY LYNN MURRAY

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: to Complaint naming Doe 1: Darren Roddy; Doe 2: Monica Roddy.

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of Answer

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: as to A.C.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to Darren Roddy Doe 1

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE - D'ANDRE GREELEY

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Monica Roddy as Doe 2 - DEFECTIVE PROOF - Item #6 of POS-010 is incomplete

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: SUMMONS

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Jacoby Lynn Murray

Order Received for Signature

Application; Comment: Order signed and issued. FF to clerks office 07/06/2017, for further processing. Forwarded to Dept:402 Order for:APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING DOE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; AND ORDER THEREON

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Darren Roddy as Doe 1 - DEFECTIVE PROOF - Item #6 of POS-010 is incomplete

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed- Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: James Buffin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2017
  • Financial info for Central Unified School District: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-19166 Central Unified School District $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Financial info for Central Unified School District: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Financial info for Central Unified School District: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Financial info for Central Unified School District: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Financial: Central Unified School District; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Financial info for C., A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-42250 C., A. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Financial info for C., A.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Financial info for C., A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-58334 C., a minor, A. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Financial info for C., A.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Financial: C., A.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.