This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 05:04:13 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Rojas-Justo, Pablo

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rojas-Justo, Pablo. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hardie, Rebecca C, O'Malley, Mary Ann and Goldstein, David E. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1419

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hardie, Rebecca C

O'Malley, Mary Ann

Goldstein, David E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Rojas-Justo, Pablo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: O'Malley, Mary Ann; Charge Number: 001; Charge Offense Description: PC245(a)(4)-F: ASSAULT BY FORCE LIKELY TO PRODUCE GBI 0002178883; Description: *Dismissal -Other Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing/ Minute Order; Judicial Officer: O'Malley, Mary Ann; Hearing Time: 8:35 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketBail Study Report Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing/ Minute Order; Judicial Officer: Goldstein, David E; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketFelony Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Goldstein, David E; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketInterpreter Ordered; Comment: Hrg Type: LIVE Language: SPANISH Hrg Date: 12/14/2022 Dept: 6 Est. Duration: 90 MINS For Party: DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPretrial Screening

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket977 Waiver of Personal Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketTime Not Waived (Limited Time Waivers Included); Comment: LD 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCourt Referral To Custody Alternative Facility

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketIn-Custody

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCourt Orders Warrant Recalled/Set Aside

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Complaint Hearing/ Minute Order; Judicial Officer: Hardie, Rebecca C; Hearing Time: 1:35 PM; Result: Felony Arraignment Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous; Comment: I/C Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketInitial Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • ChargeRojas-Justo, Pablo; 001; Description: PC245(a)(4)-F: ASSAULT BY FORCE LIKELY TO PRODUCE GBI 0002178883; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant