This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 03:00:29 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Kyer, Shanique Monet

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Kyer, Shanique Monet. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hardie, Rebecca C and Burch, Charles B. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1420

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hardie, Rebecca C

Burch, Charles B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Kyer, Shanique Monet

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketTo Set Hearing/ Minute Order; Judicial Officer: Burch, Charles B; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketPretrial Conference/ Minute Order; Judicial Officer: Burch, Charles B; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing/ Minute Order; Judicial Officer: Burch, Charles B; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketBail Study Report Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketFelony Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Burch, Charles B; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Posted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket977 Waiver of Personal Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPretrial Screening

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketTime Not Waived (Limited Time Waivers Included); Comment: LD 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketIn-Custody

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 001; Description: PC12022(a)(1)-E: ENH/SPEC ALLEG - ARMED WITH FIREARM 0000434921; Statute: 12022(a)(1); Level: Enhancement; Allegation: E01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 001; Description: PC211-F2: SECOND DEGREE ROBBERY 0002174079; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 999; Description: PC1203(e)(4)-E: ENH/SPEC ALLEG-PRIOR OFFENSES-ELIGIBILITY FOR PROBATION 0002178657; Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 999; Description: PC1203(e)(4)-E: ENH/SPEC ALLEG-PRIOR OFFENSES-ELIGIBILITY FOR PROBATION 0002178657; Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 999; Description: PC667(a)(1)-E: ENH/SPEC ALLEG - PRIOR SERIOUS FELONY CONVICTION 0002178650; Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 999; Description: PC667(a)(1)-E: ENH/SPEC ALLEG - PRIOR SERIOUS FELONY CONVICTION 0002178650; Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 999; Description: PC1170.12-E: 2ND STRKE: 1+ SERIOUS-VIOL FEL CONV/CURRENT CHRG ANY FELONY 0002178649; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 999; Description: PC1170.12-E: 2ND STRKE: 1+ SERIOUS-VIOL FEL CONV/CURRENT CHRG ANY FELONY 0002178649; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 999; Description: PC1170.12-E: 2ND STRKE: 1+ SERIOUS-VIOL FEL CONV/CURRENT CHRG ANY FELONY 0002178648; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • ChargeKyer, Shanique Monet; 999; Description: PC1170.12-E: 2ND STRKE: 1+ SERIOUS-VIOL FEL CONV/CURRENT CHRG ANY FELONY 0002178648; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant