This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/31/2017 at 11:20:02 (UTC).

ZHANG VS DOE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 ZHANG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0321

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YANTING ZHANG

Palo Alto, CA 94300

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

JOHN DOE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2017
  • UNREPORTED MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF UNREPORTED MINUTE ORDER SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLYUN SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF YANTING ZHANG FILED AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN DOE, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF YANTING ZHANG AGAINST DEFENDANT JOHN DOE, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL FILED AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN DOE WITH MAILING DATE OF 05/27/17 (CCP 415.40)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS WITH MAILING DATE OF 05/27/17 (CCP 415.40)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 7/01/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF YANTING ZHANG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.