Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 04:29:24 (UTC).

YOUNGMAN & ERICSSON VS ARCHITECTURAL CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 02/10/2012 YOUNGMAN ERICSSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARCHITECTURAL CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0088

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG & ERICSSON, LLP

1981 N. Broadway, Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendants

ARCHITECTURAL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

2556 Hoffman Lane Aos: Brian Otis

Byron, CA 84514

BRIAN OTIS

Byron, CA 94514

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2012
  • HEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/10/2012 OF YOUNG & ERICSSON, LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION SET FOR HEARING ON 7/13/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF EXAMINATION FILED FOR ARCHITECTURAL CONSTRUCTION, INC., BRIAN OTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 03/29/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 03/29/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 03/22/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/10/2012 OF YOUNG & ERICSSON, LLP AS TO DEFENDANT BRIAN OTIS FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 02/17/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/10/2012 OF YOUNG & ERICSSON, LLP AS TO DEFENDANT ARCHITECTURAL CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 02/17/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 3/22/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • UPDATE PARTY CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/10/2012 OF YOUNG & ERICSSON, LLP ARCHITECTURAL CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED-MAYRA AVILES AUTHORI ZED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $4,211.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less