Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 20:59:48 (UTC).

YESENIA S BRAMASCO VS CALPAC PIZZA

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 YESENIA S BRAMASCO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALPAC PIZZA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0798

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YESENIA SANTILLAN-BRAMASCO

Defendant

CALPAC PIZZA II LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAINES, KENNETH S

27200 Agoura Rd Suite 101

Calabasas, CA 91301

Defendant Attorney

ARIAS, CATHY L

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCOPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. CATHY L ARIAS SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR CALPAC PIZZA II LLC AND IS REPLACED BY CATHY L ARIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION & ORDER APPROVING STLMNT OF CLAIMS & DISMISSING ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketTO 103 - STIP SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketFEE RECEIVED FOR STIP AND ORDER APPROVING STLMT OF CLAIMS BY YESENIA SANTILLAN-BRAMASCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SEPIDEH ARDESTANI FILED RE: IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION RE: APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS AND DISMISSING ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCLERKS TICKLER FOR DISMISSAL WAS SET FOR 1/27/20 AT 7:00 ON 33

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 8/22/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2019 OF YESENIA SANTILLAN-BRAMASCO RE: BUSINESS CALPAC PIZZA II LLC W/MAILING ON 06/25/19 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2019 OF YESENIA SANTILLAN-BRAMASCO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/13/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 7/03/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARIAS, CATHY L