This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/17/2017 at 19:41:15 (UTC).

YEE VS ANDERSON/WATSON

Case Summary

On 11/10/2014 YEE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDERSON/WATSON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1164

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL; Disposition: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 3/12/15 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketCHECK FOR JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 11/17/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 11/10/2014 OF MICHAEL YEE AS TO DEF ENDANT CARL ANDERSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/15/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketSUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 11/10/2014 OF MICHAEL YEE AS TO DEFENDANT MINNIE WATSON WITH MAILING DATE OF 11/17/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF STIPULATION SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO/FOR ENTRY OF FUTURE JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER DATE WAS SET FOR 1/29/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO MINNIE WATSON IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 11/10/2014 OF MICHAEL YEE FILED BY CARL ANDERSON, MINNIE WATSON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CARL ANDERSON (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO CARL ANDERSON IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketFEE RECEIVED FOR COMPLAINT FEE FOR OVER $10,000 (DIFFERENCE) FROM MICHAEL YEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 12/26/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 11/10/2014 OF MICHAEL YEE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GOLDEN ROD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less