This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/22/2019 at 16:30:10 (UTC).

XU VS HAN

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 XU filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HAN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0324

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TENGFANG XU

Defendants

OMAR YANG HAN

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLEMENTS, DENZIL E

3150 Hilltop Mall Dr #35

Richmond, CA 94806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketORDER DENYING STAY OF EXECUTION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketDECLARATION OF OMAR HAN FILED RE: STAY OF EXECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNO STIP TO COMMISSIONER OR JUDGE PRO TEM BY DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketDECLARATION OF LAUREN RUSSO FILED RE: NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY OMAR YANG HAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2019 OF TENGFANG XU FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2019 OF TENGFANG XU AGAINST DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 06/04/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2019 OF TENGFANG XU FILED AS TO DEFENDANT OMAR YANG HAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2019 OF TENGFANG XU AGAINST DEFENDANT OMAR YANG HAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2019 OF TENGFANG XU AS TO DEF ENDANT OMAR YANG HAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/18/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 05/18/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 7/02/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2019 OF TENGFANG XU FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less