This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/18/2017 at 00:03:33 (UTC).

WINKLER VS. AAA

Case Summary

On 11/13/2014 WINKLER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AAA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2123

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODNEY WINKLER

BETH WINKLER

Defendants

AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH INSU

CSAA INSURANCE GROUP

CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE

CSAA INTER-INSURANCE BUREAU

PETER N THEODOR

DANIELLE DYNES

DONALD K. SAMS & ASSOCIATES, INC.

AAA NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA & UTAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OKSENENDLER, DEMIAN I

655 Montgomery Street Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

LOVELAND, R WARDELL

555 Twin Dolphin Drive Ste 300

Redwood City, CA 94065-2133

WRAITH, JAMES L

505 14Th St Suite 1200

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2014 OF RODNEY WINKLER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • CLERKS TICKLER FOR DISMISSAL WAS SET FOR 3/16/17 AT 7:00 ON 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • CASE DISPOSITIONED - SETTLED CONDITIONALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 21 TO 33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • 5FCMC4 CALENDARED ON 01/30/17 IN DEPT. 21. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 01/30/17 IN DEPT. 33.

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2014
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2014 OF RODNEY WINKLER AS TO CSAA INSURANCE GROUP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/24/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 1/09/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2014 OF RODNEY WINKLER AS TO DONALD K. SAMS & ASSOCIATES, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/24/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/13/2014 OF RODNEY WINKLER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 4/02/15 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/20/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.