This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/17/2017 at 11:52:39 (UTC).

WILLIAMS/SAVAGE VS CHAVEZ/QANAWIZIAN

Case Summary

On 09/02/2015 WILLIAMS/SAVAGE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHAVEZ/QANAWIZIAN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0636

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRYSTAL WILLIAMS

Oakley, CA 94561

DOROTHY SAVAGE

Oakley, CA 94561

KAMILA COX

Oakley, CA 94561

Defendants

CHRISTINE CHAVEZ

Antioch, CA 94531

SATTER QANAWIZIAN

Antioch, CA 94531

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 09/02/2015 OF KRYSTAL WILLIAMS AS TO CHRISTINE CHAVEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 10/23/15. FEE FOR SERVICE $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 11/20/15 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CASE RESET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 10/21/15 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less