Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 16:45:09 (UTC).

WHITE VS VALENTINE CAPITAL

Case Summary

On 08/14/2012 WHITE filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against VALENTINE CAPITAL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5412

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

VALENTINE CAPITAL ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.

Respondent

MATTHEW WHITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

GREENAN, JAMES S

6111 Gollinger Canyon Rd #500

San Ramon, CA 94583

Respondent Attorney

LABOR COMMISIONER,STATE OF CA

1515 Clay Street Suite 801

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • REFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER REALEASING UNDERTAKING;STIP TO RELEASE UNDERTAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • NOTICE OF/TO SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY MATTHEW WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • REQ SENT TO COURT FINANCIAL SVCS W/COPY PLACED IN FILE - INTERPRET ATTACHED ORDER ON PAGE 1, LINE(S) 24-27 TO MEAN: DRAW A WARRANT IN THE SUM OF $292.34, PAYABLE TO VALENTINE CAPITAL ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC. AT ADDRESS: C/O YEN P. CHAU 6111 BOLLINGER CANYON, STE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • STIPULATION TO RELEASE UNDERTAKING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • ORDER RELEASING UNDERTAKING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • REQ SENT TO COURT FINANCIAL SVCS W/COPY PLACED IN FILE - INTERPRET ATTACHED ORDER ON PAGE 1, LINE(S) 20-23 TO MEAN: DRAW A WARRANT IN THE SUM OF $1,000.00, PAYABLE TO MATTHEW WHITE AT ADDRESS: C/O SUSAN A. DOVI, LABOR COMMISSIONERS OFFICE 1515 CLAY STREET, SUI

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2012
  • NOTICE OF/TO REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENT FILED BY MATTHEW WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • UNREPORTED MINUTE ORDER WITH CERTIFICATE OF MAILIN G FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/10/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • LABOR APPEAL TRUST MONIES POSTED BY VALENTINE CAPITAL ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • RECEIPT FOR MISCELLANEOUS TRUST PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE NAME OF PARTY MATTHEW WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL ON ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less