This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 22:55:40 (UTC).

WEST VALLEY DENTAL LABORATORY INC VS STAUDHAMMER D

Case Summary

On 10/25/2012 WEST VALLEY DENTAL LABORATORY INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STAUDHAMMER D. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0770

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST VALLEY DENTALLABORATORY INC.

2110 Omega Rd Suite I

San Ramon, CA 94583

Defendant

DEBRARA STAUDHAMMER DDS

San Ramon, CA 94583

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 12/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLTF OF WEST VALLEY DENTALLABORATORY INC. AS TO DEBRARA STAUDHAMMER DDS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 11/19/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • BLACKHAWK PLAZA DENTAL ADDED AS AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • UPDATE PARTY 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLTF OF WEST VALLEY DENTALLABORATORY INC. DEBRARA STAUDHAMMER DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • (S.C.) 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLTF OF WEST VALLEY DENTALLABORATORY INC. FILED (AMENDING CONTENT WITHOUT ALTERING ORIGINAL FILING FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less