This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/29/2019 at 18:31:41 (UTC).

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY VS AVANT CANYON GROUP

Case Summary

On 11/03/2014 WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVANT CANYON GROUP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********4428

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

AVANT CANYON GROUP, INC.

CHRISTOPHER STEPHEN AVANT

ALY DEAN

MARCUS J. MADRID, INC.

JUSTIN WAYNE FARRELL

LOWRY'S, INC

SHIMON ISRAEL

NANCY MONNIG

Oakland, CA 94609

CAL STEAM

GENERAL PLUMBING SUPPLY COMPANY, INC.

J&D GLASS & SASH, INC

R&S ERECTIONOF SANFRANCISCO

MT. DIABLO FLOORING SYSTEMS, INC.

AMBER FLOORING, INC.

UNIVERSAL PLASTICS, INC.

CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAGAN, JOHN M.

18757 Burbank Boulevard Suite 305

Tarzana, CA 91356-6329

Defendant Attorney

O'DEA, BRIAN M

5000 Hopyard Rd Suite 225

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2015
  • JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 11/04/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL PLUMBING SUPPLY COMPANY, INC., J&D GLASS & SASH, INC, MT. DIABLO FLOORINGSYSTEMS, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DECLARATION OF MARK SHAFFER FILED RE: IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DECLARATION OF MARK SHAFFER FILED RE: COPIES OF THE EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT NANCY MONNIG WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • CHECK FOR RECEIPT OF DEFAULT PACKAGE ON AVANT CANYON; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2014
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO J&D GLASS & SASH, INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/17/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY RE: BUSINESS R&S ERECTIONOF SANFRANCISCO W/MAILING ON 11/19/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY FILED TO NAME AMBER FLOORING, INC. AS DOE 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/19/15 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/07/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/03/2014 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.