Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 14:19:34 (UTC).

WEN VS BURKE/MCELWEE

Case Summary

On 07/19/2012 WEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BURKE/MCELWEE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0293

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAMI WEN

Hayward, CA 94540

Defendants

AARON MCELWEE

Pleasanton, CA 94566

DANA BURKE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,365.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,340.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY. RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • AMENDED JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED BEFORE TRIAL ON 09/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • UPDATE PARTY UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/19/2012 OF TAMI WEN AARON MCELWEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • MOTION TO/FOR SET ASIDE JUDGMENT (FILED BY AARON MCELWEE ); Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • REQUEST FOR COURT/CLERK`S JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ON 07/26/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/19/2012 OF TAMI WEN FILED AS TO DEFENDANT DANA BURKE, AARON MCELWEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/19/2012 OF TAMI WEN AGAINST DEFENDANT DANA BURKE, AARON MCELWEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/19/2012 OF TAMI WEN AS TO DEF ENDANT DANA BURKE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/19/2012 OF TAMI WEN AS TO DEF ENDANT AARON MCELWEE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • SET FOR TRACKING UD CASE ON 9/04/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 1CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/19/2012 OF TAMI WEN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UP TO $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less