This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:52:43 (UTC).

WELLS VS MERITAGE HOMES

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 WELLS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MERITAGE HOMES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0453

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRENDAN CARAWAY

JOSHUA WELLS

ANTHONY GONSALVES

SHAKON MILLER

MARYA AHMADZAI

HABIB AHMADI

TINISHA MILLER

VERONICA VANEGAS

CHELSEA CARAWAY

WILLIAM VANEGAS

LAURA GONSALVES

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

T&C ROOFING, INC

MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC

CVC CONSTRUCTION CORP

CVC CONSTRUCTION CORP.

SONRAY SOLAR, INC.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ZOES 1 THROUGH 50

CVC CONSTRUCTION CORP.

MOES 1-100, INCLUSIVEVE

TIMBERLAKE CABINETRY A DIVISION OF AMERICAN

SONRAY SOLAR, INC.

IKE'S LANDSCAPE, INC.

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIRKLAND, MARK R.

1990 N. California Boulevard Suite 1060

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KASDAN, KENNETH S

1990 N. California Blvd Suite 1060

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LEVY, DAVID M

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KIRKPATRICK, CHERYL A.

2 Park Plaza Ste. 440

Irvine, CA 92614

LU, VERA CHA

1435 River Park Drive Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

YANG, JASON

2401 American River Drive Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

CORRELL, DEBORAH A

P.O. Box 293328

Sacramento, CA 95829

Other Attorneys

MCCARTHY, KEVIN P

492 Ninth Street #220

Oakland, CA 94607

BOZE, JOHN L

400 Capitol Mall Suite 1850

Sacramento, CA 95814

SCHNEIDER, WILLIAM P

P.O. Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164-0093

MORROW, WILLIAM D

1600 Dove Street Suite 315

Newport Beach, CA 92660-2487

BLACKWELL, PATRICIA A

Po Box 6107

Concord, CA 94524

BAYS, STEPHEN D.

1600 Dove Street Suite 315

Newport Beach, CA 92660-2487

ROBISON, JESSICA A

980 Fulton Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95825

SHEM, MARK W

95 South Market Street Suite 400

San Jose, CA 95113

HAZELTON, M TROY

3585 W. Beechwood Suite 101

Fresno, CA 93711

HALL, DAVID M

750 B Street Suite 2550

San Diego, CA 92101

BUREK, LAWRENCE M

6424 E Greenway Parkway Suite 100

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

39300 Civic Center Drive Suite 300

Fremont, CA 94538

HERMOSO, PAOLO A.

701 University Avenue Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

7 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 20 DAY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 20 DAY(S); Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DEFENDANT TIMBERLAKE CABINETRY A DIVISIONOF AMERICAN ADDS ATTORNEY JASON YANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY (IMAGE) FILED BY TIMBERLAKE CABINETRY A DIVISIONOF AMERICAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS/PHONE NUMBER OF ATTORNEY FIRM PATRICIA A BLACKWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
348 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON CVC CONSTRUCTION CORP. FILED; SERVED ON 03/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 03/01/2018 OF JOSHUA WELLS RE: BUSINESS T&C ROOFING, INC W/MAILING ON 04/02/18 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/01/2018 OF JOSHUA WELLS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/01/2018 OF JOSHUA WELLS PAID BY PLAINTIFFS (ONE LEGAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/16/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/04/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cvc Construction Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Ike's Landscape Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant