This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2020 at 21:30:14 (UTC).

WEINSTEIN VS. BARTLETT

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 WEINSTEIN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BARTLETT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1750

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURT WEINSTEIN

MOLLY WEINSTEIN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EDWARD DEAN ROGERS

WALTER BARTLETT

DISCOVERY BAY PROPERTYIES, INC.

ROGERS ROOFING INC

TY LEON-GUERRERO

ERIN (GONZALEZ) BROOKS

ELITE HOME INSPECTION

TY LEON-GUERRERO TEAM1REALTY.COM INC.

TANYA BARTLETT

JEFF MANN

ERIN BROOKS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TY LEON-GUERRERO

TY LEON-GUERRERO TEAM1REALTY.COM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COAD-HERMELIN, HEIDI

706 Main Street, Ste. C

Martinez, CA 94553

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GONSALVES, MARTIN T.

511 West Third Street

Antioch, CA 94509

HOBIN, RICHARD

1011 "A" Street

Antioch, CA 94509

MONTANARI, R. ERNEST

3478 Buskirk Avenue Suite 343

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

CARLSON, MARK C

3108 Crow Canyon Place Suite 109

San Ramon, CA 94583

GINELLI, R. JEREMIE

3180 Crow Canyon Place

San Ramon, CA 94583-1339

KOZLOW, ANDREW J

One Concord Center 2300 Clayton Rd, Ste 350

Concord, CA 94520

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

GINELLI, R. JEREMIE

3180 Crow Canyon Place

San Ramon, CA 94583-1339

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • HearingDept: 12; Action text: JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 15 DAY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • HearingDept: 12; Action text: COURT TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 15 DAY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingDept: 12; Action text: SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE W/SETTLEMENT MENTOR SET BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketSPECIAL SET HEARING ON: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE W/SETTLEMENT MENTOR SET BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE MAILED TO R. JEREMIE GINELLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketSPECIAL SET HEARING ON: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE W/SETTLEMENT MENTOR SET BY COURT; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMARK C CARLSON CHANGES ATTORNEY FOR TY LEON-GUERRERO TEAM1REALTY.COM INC., TY LEON-GUERRERO AND IS REPLACED BY R. JEREMIE GINELLI

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 1/16/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF BURT WEINSTEIN AS TO TANYA BARTLETT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/30/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/16/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2017 OF BURT WEINSTEIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less