This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 02/20/2020 at 03:46:59 (UTC).

WEBER VS SHEA HOMES

Case Summary

On 07/18/2002 WEBER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SHEA HOMES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3905

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2002

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICHARD P TUCKER

WILLIAM F DEE

M SUSANA MARON

ANITA M TERRY

VALERIE A THURSTON

KERRY D JACKSON

HARRY L THURSTON

CLARICE J LONDOS

GEOFFREY M MENDOZA

WINSTON ESCOBAR

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GONSALVES & SANTUCCI INC

AGI SHOWER DOOR & MIRROR

TOLER GRADING

SHEA HOMES LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP

DAVEY ROOFING

AMERICAN INSULATION CONTRACTORS

ANTIOCH BUILDING MATERIALS CO

INSIGHT GLASS

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COASTAL CONSTRUCTION AND LUMBER

TOLER GRADING

MELLO'S SHEET METAL

SHEA HOMES LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP

DAVEY ROOFING

INSIGHT GLASS

185 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RILEY, RICHARD P

100 Pringle Ave Suite 700

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ZIMMERMAN, ESQ., JON B.

160 W. Santa Clara Street Suite 1000

San Jose, CA 95113

ANTON, JAMES A.

One City Blvd West #500

Orandge, CA 92868

FOTOUHI, SHAHAB E

1111 Bayhill Drive Suite 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

MCCARTHY, KEVIN P

Other Attorneys

BYBEE, ROBERT BRUCE

500 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ZIMMERMAN, JON B.

227 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

G.GEOFFREY WOOD

2300 Clayton Road Suite 350

Concord, CA 94520

EUBANK, BRET W

41593 Winchester Rd, Suite 118

Temecula, CA 92590

WELCH, STEPHEN B

2033 North Main St, Suite 800 P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

LAMOND, CHRISTIAN

3460 Wilshire Blvd 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

LABRADOR, PETER C.

GARTHE, DAVID J

555 12Th Street, 18Th Floor P.O. Box 12925

Oakland, CA 94604-2925

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 17 TO 09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • DocketCOPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2010
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2008
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 07 TO 06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 07.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 05 TO 06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2004
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2002
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2002
  • DocketTHIS CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH MASTER CASE C02-00757

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2001
  • DocketNEW PARTY(IES) ADDED TO THIS COMPLAINT IS/ARE: KERRY D JACKSON, KIMBERLY D JACKSON, VINTON JOHNSON, SEQWENDOLYN JOHNSON, JAMES A JONES, HEATHER H JONES, PAUL KLINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2001
  • DocketNEW PARTY(IES) ADDED TO THIS COMPLAINT IS/ARE: WINSTON ESCOBAR, TELESFLORA ESCOBAR, MITCH FRADES, RICK P HELLRUNG, SUSAN T HELLRUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2001
  • DocketNEW PARTY(IES) ADDED TO THIS COMPLAINT IS/ARE: CHARLES BAHAN, BARBARA BAHAN, MARK CARTER, RICHARD W DAVILA, JESSICA DAVILA, WILLIAM F DEE, VANESSA DEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2001
  • Docket(U.J.) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF WILLIAM WEBER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2001
  • DocketNEW PARTY(IES) ADDED TO THIS COMPLAINT IS/ARE: VENICE CAHILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2001
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/20/01 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2001
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2001
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2001
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2001
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVEY ROOFING is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL CONSTRUCTION & LUMBER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SHEA HOMES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where Gonsalves & Santucci, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant