Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/07/2016 at 20:35:11 (UTC).

VICKERY VS WEST COAST HOME

Case Summary

On 10/13/2011 VICKERY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEST COAST HOME. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2370

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OSCAR MANSILLA

DENISE STOKES

ERIK GUTIERREZ

MAJIMAN HAFIZ

PHANN SAVANN

ANISHA HAFIZ

AILEEN MARTIJA

SHERRY BUIE

TOSHA RANI

KENNETH BRIGGS

JASON SCERRI

Cross Defendants

AMERICAN HEARTH PRODUCTS

CALLAWAY SECURITY & FIRE, INC

MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA,

WOODLAND STAIRS & MILLWORK

PACIFIC HEATING & SHEET METAL COMPANY, INC.

SIERRA FENCEAND LUMBER COMPANY

MOES 1-100

ZOES 1-50

WESTERN BUILDING SPECIALTIES OF SACRAMENTO

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACKSON, LEE

10250 Constellation Blvd Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

LIBERTINO, TERESA A

3731 Wilshire Blvd Suite 860

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Cross Defendant Attorney

LIEDLE, MATTHEW J

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

Other Attorneys

SANDERS, BRIAN M

2300 Clayton Road Suite 350

Concord, CA 94520

WELCH, STEPHEN B.

2033 North Main Street Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GILL, SUSAN J.

1660 Union Street Suite 301

San Diego, CA 92101

MARDEN, STEVEN M

3900 Newpark Mall Road Suite 331

Newark, CA 94560

SHAMBAUGH, CYNTHIA

560 Mission Street #2400

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

P.O. Box 293328

Sacramento, CA 95829

LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P

201 North Civic Drive Suite 145

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

VAN DE POEL, JOHN F.

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

NUNEZ, ELIZABETH A

1655 Grant Street, Ste.800-B Law Offices Of Timothy Wagner

Concord, CA 94520

ARNEAL, RICHARD G

1600 South Main Plaza, Ste 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza, Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SCHNEIDER, WILLIAM P

215 Lennon Lane Ste 200 P.O. Box 8090

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

COLTON, BRIAN E

1655 Grant St, Ste 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

2601 Airport Drive, Suite 105

Torrance, CA 90505

HART, LAWRENCE E

71 Stevenson Street Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 95131

MOKRI, NAMVAR A

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 350

Newport Beach, CA 92660

CROWLEY, DANIEL F

3558 Round Barn Blvd Suite 201

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MASTER DRYWALL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/22/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AS TO TAYLOR LANDSCAPING, INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 15 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY TRM CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
422 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID VICKERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • (U.J.) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DAVID VICKERY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • JASON SCERRI, JORGE GUZMAN ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/13/2011 OF DAVID VICKERY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/19/11 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/01/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HEARTH PRODUCTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Building Specialties, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA AKA PARAGON SCHMID BUILDING PRODUCTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILL SUSAN J. ESQ.