This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 22:11:08 (UTC).

VERNA ABBOTT VS RICHARD N JEFFERSON

Case Summary

On 05/22/2018 VERNA ABBOTT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RICHARD N JEFFERSON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2376

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VERNA ABBOTT

Antioch, CA 94531

Respondent

RICHARD N JEFFERSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR DISSOLUTION FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • (2336) FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: UNFILED 2336 JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR JUDGMENT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO RICHARD N JEFFERSON FILED. DATE COPY MAILED BY CLERK TO RESPONDENT 07/26/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/20/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/19/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/22/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/18/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 5/22/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 05/22/2018 OF VERNA ABBOTT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.