Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/31/2017 at 03:32:53 (UTC).

VENTURE PROFESSIONAL CENTER VS VPC-HERCULES LP

Case Summary

On 05/21/2012 VENTURE PROFESSIONAL CENTER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against VPC-HERCULES LP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1171

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VPC-HERCULES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A

VENTURE COMMERCE CENTER,INC.

LUSARDI CONSTRUCTION CO.

BARBACCIA GLASS COMPANY

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

C/S ERECTORS, INC.

BLACKWELL GENERAL ENGINEERING,INC.

WATSON ROOFING, INC.

RISSE & SONS, INC.

PRECISION MASONRY

WEST COAST SACKING, INC.

MICHAEL D. BURNS COMPANY, INC.

R.K. ELECTRIC, INC.

S. NAVA & SON PLASTERING COMPANY, INC.

SOUTHLAND INDUSTRIES

MID-STATE STEEL ERECTORS, INC.

MOES 1 THROUGH 200, INCLUSIVE

TGM COMMERCAIL GLAZING

BAYSIDE INTERIORS,INC.

BARBACCIA GLASS COMPANY

SACRAMENTO REBAR, INC.

Intervenor

LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GUSTAFSON, RANDALL D

550 West "C" Street Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

MCCURDY, KATY C

550 West "C" Street Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

REDFIELD, CHARLES S

505 Montgomery Street 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2584

GUSTAFSON, RANDALL D

550 West "C" Street Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

MCCURDY, KATY C

550 West "C" Street Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

FREEDMAN, KARREN L

215 Lennon Lane, Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

BLAKE, ALBERT P

1655 Grant St, Ste 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

STONE, COLETTE F

2125 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

LANDRY, KARIN L

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

STONE, ESQ., COLETTE F.

2125 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

FORBATH, JOSEPH W

555 Anton Blvd Suite 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

SCHLUETER, DAVID S

31365 Oak Crest Drive, Ste 250

Westlake Village, CA 91361

BJORGE, BRYAN T

11290 Pyrites Way Suite 210

Rancho Cordova, CA 95670

MCNAIR, LISA A

5250 North Palm Avenue Suite 201

Fresno, CA 93704

MORROW, WILLIAM D

535 Anton Blvd Suite 1150

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Intervenor Attorney

HAMILTON, ROBERT P

417 Montgomery Street Tenth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

MAYFIELD, LORI R

1435 River Park Dr Suite 504

Sacramento, CA 95815

ESTABROOK, LISA M.

301 University Ave., Ste. 110

Sacramento, CA 95825-5537

HERP, PAUL A

525 Mark Street Suite 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

ARNEAL, RICHARD G

1600 South Main Plaza, Ste 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MARX, MICHAEL L.

417 Montgomery Street 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

RUSSELL, LARRY F

2900 Camino Diablo Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94597-3912

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: PROVE UP HEARING SET BY THE COURT DURING THE 3/4/15 HEARING; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WALLIS STEEL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: PROVE UP HEARING SET BY THE COURT DURING THE 3/4/15 HEARING; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF HEARING TO LARRY RUSSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING EXPARTE APP TO CONTINUE HRG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: PROVE UP HEARING SET BY THE COURT DURING THE 3/4/15 HEARING; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DECLARATION OF KARIN L LANDRY FILED RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE PROVE-UP HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING PROVE UP HEARING TO 9-25-15 AT 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
540 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2012
  • (U.J.) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF VENTURE PROFESSIONAL CENTER-HERCULES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • NEW PARTY(IES) ADDED TO THIS COMPLAINT IS/ARE: LUSARDI CONSTRUCTION CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/21/2012 OF VENTURE PROFESSIONAL CENTER-HERCULES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/31/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 7/05/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/21/2012 OF VENTURE PROFESSIONAL CENTER-HERCULES PAID BY PLAINTIF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURE COMMERCE CENTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Watson Roofing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYSIDE INTERIORS,INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Michael D. Burns Company, Inc. is a litigant