This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/11/2016 at 03:17:11 (UTC).

VENTURA VS NUNNELLY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/31/2009 VENTURA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NUNNELLY,. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Contra Costa County Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0739

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDGAR VENTURA

Defendants

TOMIKA NUNNELLY

DORIS NUNNELLY

Concord, CA 94520

ADRIENNE SNAPLES

Concord, CA 94520

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSEN, TIMOTHY A

610 16Th Street Suite 516

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketCLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketCOPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketPARTIAL DISMISSAL ENTERED/FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2009 OF EDGAR VENTURA AS TO DANNY GOMEZ ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED; AS TO ADRIENNE SNAPLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2009 OF EDGAR VENTURA AS TO DEF ENDANT TOMIKA NUNNELLY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/06/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2009 OF EDGAR VENTURA AS TO DEF ENDANT DORIS NUNNELLY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/02/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2009 OF EDGAR VENTURA AS TO DEF ENDANT ADRIENNE SNAPLES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/06/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • DocketSERVICE ON ADRIENNE SNAPLES IS QUESTIONABLE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: FIRST NAME MISSPELLED ON PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DORIS NUNNELLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketORDER FILED ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO DORIS NUNNELLY IS GRANTED.; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ADRIENNE SNAPLES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketORDER FILED ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO ADRIENNE SNAPLES IS GRANTED.; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2009 OF EDGAR VENTURA FILED BY DORIS NUNNELLY, ADRIENNE SNAPLES. ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • DocketHEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 9/23/09 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2009 OF EDGAR VENTURA FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSEN, TIMOTHY A.