This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:11:51 (UTC).

VENTANA VS. LARTIQUE

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 VENTANA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LARTIQUE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0785

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G & I VIII VENTANALP

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

MICHAEL LARTIQUE

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, FIDLER, CHAPLAN & HICKS, LLP

2719 Wilsire Boulevard Second Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDMENT FILED ON 9/8/16 SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - CONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 09/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2016 OF G & I VIII VENTANALP FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2016 OF G & I VIII VENTANALP AGAINST DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 07/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • COURT REPORTER NOT REQUESTED BY G & I VIII VENTANALP

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2016
  • ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2016 OF G & I VIII VENTANALP AS TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL LARTIQUE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/27/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MICHAEL LARTIQUE (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO MICHAEL LARTIQUE IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2016 OF G & I VIII VENTANALP FILED BY MICHAEL LARTIQUE REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 9/09/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/26/2016 OF G & I VIII VENTANALP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G&I VIII VENTANA LP is a litigant