This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:40:49 (UTC).

VASQUEZ VS. HALL EQUITIES

Case Summary

On 12/06/2016 VASQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HALL EQUITIES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2311

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRYSTAL VASQUEZ

Defendant

HALL EQUITIES GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAPPAS, MARK BASIL

1080 West "K" Street

Benicia, CA 94510

Defendant Attorney

LAMIERO, JESSICA P.

401 Lennon Lane Suite 125

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2018
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT SET BY DEPT. 9; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF/TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY HALL EQUITIES GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HALL EQUITIES GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CRYSTAL VASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HALL EQUITIES GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 5/12/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2016 OF CRYSTAL VASQUEZ RE: BUSINESS HALL EQUITIES GROUP W/MAILING ON 03/27/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/06/2016 OF CRYSTAL VASQUEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 4/25/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/09/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.