Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/30/2016 at 17:29:17 (UTC).

VALLEY COMMERCIAL VS WINDSOR

Case Summary

On 11/25/2008 VALLEY COMMERCIAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WINDSOR. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2958

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PACIFIC COAST SUPPLY LLC

RJP FRAMING, INC.

GDH ENTERPRISES

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants, Appellants, Cross Plaintiffs and Intervenor Defendants

WINDSOR WALNUT CREEK APARTMENTS, LLC

TARIGO PROPERTIES,LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Appellants and Intervenor Defendants

VALLEY COMMERCIAL CONTRACTORS, LP

WINDSOR WALNUT CREEK APARTMENTS, LLC.

WINDSOR WALNUT CREEK APARTMENTS, LLC

MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

WINDSOR WALNUT CREEK APARTMENTS LLC

TARIGO PROPERTIES,LLC

HORIZON CONTRACT GLAZING, INC.

REGIONAL STEEL CORPORATIONORATION

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Appellants and Intervenor Defendants

OLIVEIRA PLASTERING, LATHING AND DRYWALL, I

VALLEY COMMERCIAL CONTRACTORS, LP

A&B CONSTRUCTION, INC.

HORIZON CONTRACT GLAZING, INC.

REX MOORE ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS & ENGRS, I

ANDREW BEHRENS

ACE IRON, INC

31626 Hayman Street

Hayward, CA 94544

MOES 1 THRU 25

WINDSOR WALNUT CREEK APARTMENTS, LLC

LANDAVAZO BROS., INC.

RJP FRAMING, INC.

REGIONAL STEEL CORPORATIONORATION

TARIGO PROPERTIES,LLC

CORE CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Appellant and Intervenor

TARIGO PROPERTIES,LLC

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

MARTUCCI, MICHAEL L

601 University Av., Suite 250

Sacramento, CA 95825

WARD, ESQ., KENNETH C.

2033 N. Main Street Ste 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

OLSEN, JEFFREY G.

5005 Windplay Drive #4

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

LEONIDOU & ROSIN

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

Cross Defendant, Defendant, Respondent, Appellant, Cross Plaintiff and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

COSTELL, JEFFREY LEE

1299 Ocean Ave Ste 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1007

MCNEELY, RICHARD M

1550 Parkside Drive, Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PAGANELLI, CARL

1550 Parkside Drive Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3531

DRAGE, CHRISTINE E

23212 Mill Creek Dr.

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

ADELSON, LEWIS B

1299 Ocean Avenue

Santa Monica, CA 90401

O'MEARA, JOHN V

20320 Sw Birch Street Second Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LEONIDOU, ESQ., JANETTE G.

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

MCIVER, DARLENE M

5720 Oberlin Drive

San Diego, CA 92121

KUPERSTEIN, JERRY M

1621 Executive Ct

Sacramento, CA 95864

HAIMOVICI, RANDALL D

One Montgomery Suite 2700

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCCORMICK, JAMES L

417 Montgomery Street 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

MARTUCCI, MICHAEL L

601 University Av., Suite 250

Sacramento, CA 95825

WARD, ESQ., KENNETH C.

2033 N. Main Street Ste 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ANDERSON, STEPHEN K

257 Battery Street Suite 550

San Francisco, CA 94111

Intervenor Attorneys

MURAI, GARRET D

400 Capitol Mall 27Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

MURAI, GARRETT D

1111 Broadway Suite 1500

Oakland, CA 94607

Other Attorneys

STARSKY, JEFFREY M

4700 Lang Ave

Mcclellan, CA 95652

STONE, ESQ., COLETTE F.

2125 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

15 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF/TO WITHDRAWL OF MTN TO COMPEL MARCUS AND MILLICHAP FILED BY TARIGO PROPERTIES,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DECLARATION OF YASMEEN OMIDI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION: TO COMPEL NON-PARTY MARCUS AND MILLICHAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL NON-PARTY MARCUS AND MILLICHAP FILED BY TARIGO PROPERTIES,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • HEARING ON MOTION WAS SET FOR 10/13/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS-ORDER AFTER HEARING RETURN TO SENDER, UNCLAIMED, UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL NONPARTY MICHAEL ROBERTS TO APPEAR FILED BY TARIGO PROPERTIES,LLC; Disposition: OFF-CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFS MTN TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
1,844 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLAINTIFF; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • (U.J.) CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY WINDSOR WALNUT CREEK APARTMENTS, LLC, WINDSOR CAPITAL GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/25/2008 OF VALLEY COMMERCIAL CONTRACTORS FILED BY WINDSOR WALNUT CREEK APARTMENTS, LLC, WINDSOR CAPITAL GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/25/2008 OF VALLEY COMMERCIAL CONTRACTORS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINDSOR WALNUT CREEK APARTMENTS, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE IRON, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GDH ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDAVAZO BROS. INC. is a litigant