This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/20/2017 at 10:20:54 (UTC).

VALADEZ VS. WEST COAST HOME BUILDERS

Case Summary

On 05/17/2016 VALADEZ filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WEST COAST HOME BUILDERS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1726

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUAN VALADEZ

ELVIRA VALADEZ

HERMAN DAVIS

NANETTE DAVIS

PHU TRUONG

IRMGARD PADILLA

TIFFANY MARCUS

DEANDRE MARCUS

MINAL MARAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WEST COAST HOME BUILDERS, INC

ALBERT D SEENO CONSTRUCTION CO, LP

ALBERT D SEENO CONSTRUCTION CO, INC

DESILVA GATES CONSTRUCTION, LP

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VINCI MASONRY

DESILVA GATES CONSTRUCTION, LP

GARCIA CONCRETE SPECIALISTS

MID-VALLEY PLASTERING

DMC CONCRETE

LASTER LANDSCAPE

COASTAL LUMBER

ROES 1 THROUGH 200

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KASDAN, KENNETH S

100 Pringle Avenue Suite 700

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

THOMSON, SCOTT J

1990 N. California Blvd Suite 1060

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KIRKLAND, MARK R.

1990 N. California Boulevard Suite 1060

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P

201 North Civic Drive Suite 145

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MARDEN, STEVEN M

3900 New Park Mall Road Ste 323

Newark, CA 94560

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MARDEN, STEVEN M

3900 New Park Mall Road Ste 323

Newark, CA 94560

Other Attorneys

ZAPPELLI, VERONIKA J

1120 Nye Street, Ste.300

San Rafael, CA 94901

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 30 DAY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING PLNTFS MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO ADD PLNTFS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDMENT TO CMPLNT TO ADD PLNTF FILED BY JUAN VALADEZ; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF/TO ERRATA RE CMO NO.1 FILED BY WEST COAST HOME BUILDERS, INC, ALBERT D. SEENO CONSTRUCTION CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2015
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2015 OF JUAN VALADEZ RE: BUSINESS WEST COAST HOME BUILDERS, INC W/MAILING ON 10/06/15 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 11/20/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2015 OF JUAN VALADEZ PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2015 OF JUAN VALADEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 12/04/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/13/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.