This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 12:37:46 (UTC).

USA VS TALIANI

Case Summary

On 01/22/2010 USA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TALIANI. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0065

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA MULTIFAMILY MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendants

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

CHERIE M TALIANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLY, ADRIENNE R

7676 Hazard Center Drive Ste 900-C

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2011
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0004 PARTIALLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 10/18/10 TO ALAMEDA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $700.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • LETTER LODGED FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY SHERIFF RE:CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • ORDER TO/FOR DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • HEARING WAS SET FOR 3/04/11 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY USA MULTIFAMILY MANAGEMENT, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $77.11

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2010 OF USA MULTIFAMILY MANAGEMENT, INC. AGAINST DEFENDANT CHERIE M TALIANI, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON 01/22/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2010 OF USA MULTIFAMILY MANAGEMENT, INC. AS TO DEF ENDANT CHERIE M TALIANI WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/22/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 3/10/10 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2010 OF USA MULTIFAMILY MANAGEMENT, INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA MULTIFAMILY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY ADRIENNE R