Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/06/2017 at 14:54:32 (UTC).

UBS VS PALERMO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2011 UBS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PALERMO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0452

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UBS REALTY INVESTORS, LLC

Defendant

JENNIFER PALERMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

4261 Norwalk Drive #107

San Jose, CA 95129

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2016
  • ORDER TO ENTER SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/27/2011 OF UBS REALTY INVESTORS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ORDER TO ENTER SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JENNIFER PALERMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY. RETURNED WHOLLY UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY; Disposition: WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/27/2011 OF UBS REALTY INVESTORS, LLC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT JENNIFER PALERMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/27/2011 OF UBS REALTY INVESTORS, LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT JENNIFER PALERMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ON 10/04/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/27/2011 OF UBS REALTY INVESTORS, LLC AS TO DEF ENDANT JENNIFER PALERMO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/27/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • SET FOR TRACKING UD CASE ON 11/14/11 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 1CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/27/2011 OF UBS REALTY INVESTORS, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UP TO $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBS REALTY INVESTORS LLC A MASSACHUSETTS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.