Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 03:35:16 (UTC).

TRUONG VS. ZEZZA

Case Summary

On 06/15/2016 TRUONG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ZEZZA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0581

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEAN TRUONG

Defendants

CY ZEZZA

Pittsburg, CA 94565

ALL OCCUPANTS

NINA ZEZZA

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIS, DANIEL T

3220 Stevens Creek Blvd Ste A

San Jose, CA 95117

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • ORDER TO/FOR FOR JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - UNCONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 07/26/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • UD TRIAL SET FOR 7/26/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY SEAN TRUONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • COURT REPORTER NOT REQUESTED BY SEAN TRUONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/15/2016 OF SEAN TRUONG

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO CY ZEZZA IS DENIED; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CY ZEZZA (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY NINA ZEZZA (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • FEE WAIVERS SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/15/2016 OF SEAN TRUONG FILED BY CY ZEZZA, NINA ZEZZA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 8/01/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/15/2016 OF SEAN TRUONG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIS, DANIEL T.