This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 03/13/2019 at 07:18:23 (UTC).

TRINH VS. STAFFORD

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 TRINH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STAFFORD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOM TRINH

Defendant

MICHELL STAFFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, RONALD R.

79 Panoramic Ave.

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketFAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketWE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE MEMO ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MICHELL STAFFORD (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO MICHELL STAFFORD IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 2/25/19 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/09/2019 OF TOM TRINH FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johnson, Ronald Roy