Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:42:06 (UTC).

TOBLER VS JAMES POTTS

Case Summary

On 10/30/2012 TOBLER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JAMES POTTS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1353

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID TOBLER

JANE TOBLER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JAMES POTTS

NADINE POTTS

SUMMIT LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

BOB GIBSON

DANIEL COCHRAN

DLI CONSTRUCTION

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SUMMIT LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

BOB GIBSON

DANIEL COCHRAN

JOSEPH COSTELLA

Not Classified By Court

CASE MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROMBERG, DAVID B

1350 Treat Blvd Suite 420

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KAPLAN, ANN S

2298 Durant Ave

Berkeley, CA 94704

SHARPE, LINDA J.L.

12009 Foundation Place Ste 190

Gold River, CA 95670

OTT, GREGORY D

276 Kingsbury Grade Suite 2000

Lake Tahoe, NV 89449-3390

WELCH, MICHAEL

6210 Stoneridge Mall Road Suite 550

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Not Classified By Court Attorney

VENNER, CHARLOTTE M.

46 Ryan Avenue

Mill Valley, CA 94941

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF RECUSAL MAILED TO LINDA SHARPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DENYING PLTFS MTN FILED 1/3/18 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • ORDER FILED DENYING PLTFS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGME NT AND ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR VACATE JUDGMENT/ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY DAVID TOBLER, JANE TOBLER; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • REPLY OF SUMMIT LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC., BOB GIBSON TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DAVID B STROMBERG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION A FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF RECUSAL MAILED TO GREGORY D. OTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF RESASSIGNMENT OF CASE, SENT TO GREGORY D. OTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DAVID TOBLER, JANE TOBLER; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE SENT TO ALL ACTIVE AND DISPO`D PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
283 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2012
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/08/2012 OF DAVID TOBLER AS TO BOB GIBSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/21/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/08/2012 OF DAVID TOBLER AS TO SUMMIT LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/13/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/08/2012 OF DAVID TOBLER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/26/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less