This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 12:04:08 (UTC).

TIMOTHY M. PLOWS VS JENNIFER A. PESTANA

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 TIMOTHY M PLOWS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JENNIFER A PESTANA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2448

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TIMOTHY M. PLOWS

Martinez, CA 94553

Respondent

JENNIFER A. PESTANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • CHECK FOR $435 FIRST APP FEE DUE FROM PETITIONER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR FIRST APP FEE FROM TIMOTHY M. PLOWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO TIMOTHY M. PLOWS IS DENIED; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • PLACED ON CLERK`S CALENDAR FOR 6/18/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY TIMOTHY M. PLOWS (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/29/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/25/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 5/30/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 05/29/2018 OF TIMOTHY PLOWS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/27/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/26/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.