Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/16/2017 at 03:15:54 (UTC).

THOMAS VS. KIEWIT

Case Summary

On 12/18/2013 THOMAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KIEWIT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2640

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL THOMAS

Defendant

KIEWIT POWER CONSTRUCTORS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANOUKIAN, DIRK L

1277 Treat Blvd Suite 850

Walnut Creek, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • CASE IS CLOSED - NO FURTHER ACTION TO BE TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - CHANGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • CASE REMOVED FROM COURT`S CONTROL DUE TO U.S. DISTRICT CTCV -01161-JSC HAVING BEEN FILED/ENTERED INTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CASE TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT BY KIEWIT POWER CONSTRUCTOR CO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • 5OPSC5 CALENDARED ON 02/24/14 IN DEPT. 06. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 02/24/14 IN DEPT. 34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • 5CMC5 CALENDARED ON 05/07/14 IN DEPT. 06. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 05/07/14 IN DEPT. 34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2013 OF MICHAEL THOMAS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/07/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/24/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIEWIT POWER CONSTRUCTORS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANOUKIAN DIRK LENORD