Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/02/2017 at 11:35:55 (UTC).

THOMAS VAUGHNS VS RON BAKER

Case Summary

On 01/18/2013 THOMAS VAUGHNS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RON BAKER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0116

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

THOMAS VAUGHNS

BESSIE VAUGHNS

DR. THOMAS E VAUGHNS

DR. BESSIE M VAUGHNS

THOMAS E. AND BESSIE VAUGHNS REVOCABLE TRUS

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RON BAKER

YOUR SOIL SOLUTIONS

QUINTERO CONSTRUCTION CO

JOHN PLANE CONSTRUCTION

LARRY QUINTANA

ROCK TRANSPORT, INC.

JOHN PLANE CONSTRUCTION, INC

YOUR SOIL SOLUTION, INC

ROCK TRANSPORT INC

YOUR SOIL SOLUTIONS, INC

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THOMAS VAUGHNS

BESSIE VAUGHNS

RON BAKER

LARRY QUINTANA

DR. BESSIE M. VAUGHNS, TRUSTEE

DR. THOMAS E. VAUGHNS, TRUSTEE

ROCK TRANSPORT, INC.

DR. THOMAS E VAUGHNS

JOHN PLANE CONSTRUCTION, INC

DR. BESSIE M VAUGHNS

YOUR SOIL SOLUTION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MIRANTE, JEANNE N.

1814 Franklin St, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

COHEN, MICHAEL C

1814 Franklin Street Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BENNETT, DAVID H

P.O. Box 293328

Sacramento, CA 95829

ROTH, DAVID

333 Bush St. 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

LUM, MICHAEL M

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MIRANTE, JEANNE N.

1814 Franklin St, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

COHEN, MICHAEL C

1814 Franklin Street Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

BENNETT, DAVID H

P.O. Box 293328

Sacramento, CA 95829

ROTH, DAVID

333 Bush St. 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

LUM, MICHAEL M

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ALL REMAINING DOES 1-20 ONLY ON CROSS-COMPLAINT OF JOHN PLANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DIMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF JOHN PLANE CONSTRUCTION, INC AS TO DEFENDANT LARRY QUINTANA WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF JOHN PLANE CONSTRUCTION, INC AS TO DEFENDANT RON BAKER, YOUR SOIL SOLUTION,INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 8/17/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
202 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2013
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THOMAS VAUGHNS, QUINTERO CONSTRUCTION CO IS REMOVED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • (U.J.) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THOMAS VAUGHNS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • NEW PARTY(IES) ADDED TO THIS COMPLAINT IS/ARE: LARRY QUINTANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/25/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2013 OF THOMAS VAUGHNS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/26/13 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUR SOIL SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHN PLANE CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where ROCK TRANSPORT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUM, MICHAEL M.