This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 03/02/2023 at 13:44:24 (UTC).

THE THOMPSON FAMILY TRUST DATED 4-28-86

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 THE THOMPSON FAMILY TRUST DATED 4-28-86 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fenstermacher, Susanne M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0468

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fenstermacher, Susanne M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THOMPSON, RON

Not Classified By Court

THE THOMPSON FAMILY TRUST DATED CREATED BY EDGAR WALTER, THOMPSON & ELSIE J UNE THOMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ABRAMS, ELLIOTT

2815 Mitchell Drive Suite 270

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: ORDER MODIFYING TRUST FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: SIGNED ORDER W/FILE SENT TO CLERKS OFFICE (COPY & SASE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition in Re:; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: 000100+PTN FOR ORDER+MODIFYING TRUST+03/15/21+0001+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: DECLARATION OF RON THOMPSON FILED RE: THE ORIGINAL TRUST AND AMENDMENTS %%X%% %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: DECLARATION OF RON THOMPSON FILED RE: STATING CURRENT ADDRESSES OF ALL PERSON ENTITLED TO NOTICE %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETN FOR ORD MODIFYING TRUST FILED (07/01/21 9AM D15) W/ POS BY MAIL ON 04/26/21 TO - SEE LIST -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: DECLARATION OF ELSIE JUNE THOMPSON FILED RE: ISO PTN FOR ORDER MODIFYING TRUST %%X%% %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketHearing set for:; Comment: Hearing was set for 7/01/21 at 9:00 in Dept. 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Comment: CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProbate Referee Assigned; Comment: REFEREE DJE IS ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProbate Trust Petition Filed; Comment: In re: PROBATE TRUST FILED *FEE: 210420-0187-CK PRP/ 435.00 Paymt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less