This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/28/2017 at 02:56:38 (UTC).

THE OLD SPAGHETTI FACTORY VS. BURGOS

Case Summary

On 12/11/2013 THE OLD SPAGHETTI FACTORY filed a Labor - Workplace Harassment lawsuit against BURGOS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1866

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Harassment

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF WORKPLACE VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HRG ON ROSEMARY BURGOS FILED. SERVED ON 12/31/13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • DocketORDER AFTER HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT OF EMPLOYEE (CLETS) FILED; PROTECTED PERSON: HEATHER KAWALKOWSKI / ORDER EXPIRES: 12/31/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC/TRO RE: HARASSMENT (CIVIL) FILED BY THE OLD SPAGHETTI FACTORY; Disposition: GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • DocketPROOF PERSONAL SVC OF NTC OF HRG/TRO***NO DATE, NO TIME, NO ADDRESS*** LINE #6 IS NOT COMPLETED AT A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC/TRO CIVIL HARASSMENT WAS SET FOR 12/31/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 194

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketTEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS RED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF/TO COURT HEARING FILED BY THE OLD SPAGHETTI FACTORY, HEATHER KAWALKOWSKI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketPETITION OF OLD SPAGHETTI FACTORY AND HEATHER KAWALKOWSKI FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT OF EMPLOYEE (WORKPLACE HARASSMENT) FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less