Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/23/2017 at 20:46:57 (UTC).

TESORO MARKETING AND REFINARY VS FEAGINS

Case Summary

On 09/10/2012 TESORO MARKETING AND REFINARY filed a Labor - Workplace Harassment lawsuit against FEAGINS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1396

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Harassment

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

NIDIA GALARZA

DEONDRE WINSTON

LINDSEY AUXIER

CRYSTAL DAVIS

KENDRA MORRIS

TESORO MARKETING AND REFINARY

1910 Somersville Rd

Antioch, CA 94509

RICKY FEAGINS

Respondent and Not Classified By Court

RICKY FEAGINS

Petitioner, Other and Not Classified By Court

LINDSEY AUXIER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC/TRO RE: HARASSMENT (CIVIL) FILED BY TESORO MARKETING AND REFINARY; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • APPLICATION & ORDER FOR RE-ISSUANCE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY TESORO MARKETING AND REFINARY, LINDSEY AUXIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC/TRO RE: HARASSMENT (CIVIL) FILED BY TESORO MARKETING AND REFINARY; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • (CIVIL HARASSMENT) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL PETITION FILED 09/10/2012 OF TESORO MARKETING AND REFINARY AS TO RICKY FEAGINS, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • LINDSEY AUXIER, CRYSTAL DAVIS, NIDIA GALARZA, KENDRA MORRIS, DEONDRE WINSTON ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • LINDSEY AUXIER ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • ON CIVIL PETITION FILED 09/10/2012 OF TESORO MARKETING AND REFINARY 0001 PARTY TYPE CHANGED TO PETITIONER FROM PARTY TYPE EMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC/TRO CIVIL HARASSMENT WAS SET FOR 9/27/12 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • PETITION OF TESORO MARKETING AND REFINARY FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT OF EMPLOYEE (WORKPLACE HARASSMENT) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less