This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 20:39:32 (UTC).

TERESA G. STRONG VS DAVID A. BERNAL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 TERESA G STRONG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DAVID A BERNAL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1023

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TERESA G STRONG

Oakley, CA 94561

Respondent

DAVID A BERNAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/29/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/27/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 2/26/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/26/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 2/27/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE NAME OF PARTY TERESA G STRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 02/26/2018 OF TERESA STRONG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY TERESA G STRONG (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO TERESA G STRONG IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.