This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 00:00:27 (UTC).

TANYA CHALICH VS JOHN CHALICH

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 TANYA CHALICH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHN CHALICH. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1200

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TANYA CHALICH

Respondent

JOHN CHALICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TERENCE DANIEL DOYLE LAW OFFICE

571 Hartz Ave

Danville, CA 94526

Respondent Attorney

SCHICK, ESQ., DANIEL B.

150 N. Wiget Lane, Suite 105

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • RESPONSE TO DISSO/NULLITY/LEGAL SEP OF JOHN CHALICH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • (F/L) PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL , W/NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF PETITION, SUMMONS SIGNED BY JOHN CHALICH ON 03/28/18 AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/05/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/08/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/09/2018 OF TANYA CHALICH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/07/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/05/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/11/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.