This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 21:06:25 (UTC).

SZFM VS CORTESE

Case Summary

On 06/09/2008 SZFM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CORTESE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1540

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff

SZFM DESIGN STUDIO, INC.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

CORTESE PROPERTIESLLC

DIABLO PLUMBING, INC.

HIGASH & ASSOCIATES

SZFM DESIGN STUDIO, INC.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DIABLO PLUMBING

CORTESE PROPERTIESLLC

DIABLO PLUMBING, INC.

SKM CONSULTING ENGINEERS

HIGASH & ASSOCIATES

OVERAA & COMPANY

SZFM DESIGN STUDIO, INC.

C. OVERAA & CO.

JENSEN MECHANICAL

KPFF CONSULT ING ENGINEER S

KPFF CONSULTING ENGINEERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorney

BURESH, JILL M

One California Street 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAHADERNE, PAUL B

One Market Plaza Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FENECH, JOSEPH M

505 Montgomery Street 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

PANDELL, JEROME C

1990 N California Blvd Suite 1010

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BURESH, JILL M

One California Street 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

GIARDINA, MARIA

One Market Plaza Steuart Tower, 8Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94105

GIARDINA, MARIA J

One Market Plaza Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GRILLI, SARAH T

1300 Clay Street Suite 100

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2010
  • NOTICE OF/TO ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON BEHALF OF CORTESE PROPERTIESLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DIABLO PLUMBING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CORTESE PROPERTIES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF SZFM DESIGN STUDIO,INC. AS TO DEFENDANT C. OVERAA & CO. WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF HIGASH ASSOCIATES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 08/26/2008 OF SZFM DESIGN STUDIO,INC. AS TO DEFENDANT HIGASH & ASSOCIATES, SKM CONSULTING ENGINEERS WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SZFM DESIGN STUDIO,INC. AS TO DEFENDANT CORTESE PROPERTIESLLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • 5ODC5 CALENDARED ON 02/16/10 IN DEPT. 16. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 02/16/10 IN DEPT. 19.

    Read MoreRead Less
195 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2008
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/09/2008 OF SZFM DESIGN STUDIO,INC. AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/13/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 7/28/08 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/13/08 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/27/08 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • NEW PARTY(IES) ADDED TO THIS COMPLAINT IS/ARE: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/09/2008 OF SZFM DESIGN STUDIO,INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIABLO PLUMBING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KPFF CONSULTING ENGINEERS is a litigant

Latest cases where C. OVERAA & CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant