This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/17/2017 at 13:53:12 (UTC).

SYLVIA WHITLEY VS. CHEVRON USA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2014 SYLVIA WHITLEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHEVRON USA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1257

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SYLVIA WHITLEY

STANTON RICHARDSON, JR

STANTON RICHARDSON, III

DOMINIQUE RICHARDSON

EDWARD PIERRE

EMMA BARNETT

Petitioners

MEIKO ANN BRADLEY-DAVIS

GREGORY JONES

ONTARIANA GANT

RONA AQUINO

KEYIA SIMPSON

CEDRIC SAUNDERS

LASONJA SIMPSON

Defendant

CHEVRON USA INC

Others

EMON HOPKINS

ALONZO STEPHENS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Other and Petitioner Attorney

BECKLEY, KYLE R

600 Travis St Suite 7300

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

FILICE III, GENNARO A

101 Second Street Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2018
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 45 DAY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 45 DAY(S); Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2014
  • PETITION/DECLARATION TO APPOINT A GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR EMON HOPKINS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • 2 GAL APPS & ORDS W/FILE TO RM 103 TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/09/2014 OF SYLVIA WHITLEY PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • --RELATED CASE NUMBER IS: C14-00328

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/11/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/25/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS NOT (NEED GAL SIGNED) ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.