This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:36:45 (UTC).

SUMMIT VS. MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 SUMMIT filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0293

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IAN SUMMIT

VICTOR BANUELOS

DENNIS BUCHHOLZ

DEBRA BUCCHOLZ

JESSE CURIEL

MICHAEL DAVTIAN

NVART DAVTIAN

MICHAEL DEVITO

CATHERINE DEVITO

MARK FILIPPELLI

STEVEN FOSENBURG

SALLY FOSENBURG

MICHAEL JOKSCH

LORELYN JOKSCH

JOHN KAANEHE

MELVIN LAYTON

VIADILIA LAYTON

FRANK MARTELLA

CAROL MARTELLA

GLENN SJOUWKE

98 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN, MARK

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Other Attorneys

FOSTER, JESSICA C

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

MCCAFFERY, TIMOTHY J.

1999 Harrison St., Ste 2600

Oakland, CA 94612-3541

TSANG, KENNETH B

39300 Civic Center Drive Suite 300

Fremont, CA 94538

HUGUENIN, EDWARD R.

3741 Douglas Blvd Suite 290

Roseville, CA 95661

COX, CHIP

2000 Crow Canyon Place Suite 380

San Ramon, CA 94583

ZAPPELLI, VERONIKA J

1120 Nye Street, Ste.300

San Rafael, CA 94901

SHAMBAUGH, CYNTHIA

525 Market Street Suite 2900

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMONI, PAUL V

P.O. Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164-0093

LEVY, DAVID M

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

LEENERTS, ERIC M

980 Ninth Street 16Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

GLAVINOVICH, NATALIE V

1600 S. Main Plaza, Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2017 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC AS TO DEFENDANT MID VALLEY PLASTERING, INC. WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2017 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC AS TO DEFENDANT D & E DRYWALL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2017 OF MERITAGE HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC AS TO DEFENDANT CANDELARIA UNIQUE FENCE WORKS, T&C ROOFING, INC. WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
362 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2014
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/11/2014 OF IAN SUMMIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 4/16/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/28/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/11/2014 OF IAN SUMMIT PAID BY MILSTEIN ADELMAN LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEENERTS ERIC M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zappelli, Veronika Jacqueline

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMONI, PAUL V

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COX CHIP B.