Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/01/2017 at 21:07:35 (UTC).

SUKHMINDER BAINS VS. SARBIT BAINS

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 SUKHMINDER BAINS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SARBIT BAINS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4116

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SUKHMINDER KAUR BAINS

Antioch, CA 94509

Respondent

SARBJIT SINGH BAINS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2013
  • CHECK FOR DISPO/JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • (2336) FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR DISSOLUTION FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • UPDATE TRACK ASSIGNMENT TO CONVENTIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO SARBJIT SINGH BAINS FILED. DATE COPY MAILED BY CLERK TO RESPONDENT 10/04/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 08/23/2012 OF SUKHMINDER BAINS AGAINST SARBJIT SINGH BAINS BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 08/23/2012 OF SUKHMINDER BAINS AS TO SARBJIT SINGH BAINS (SERVED ON 08/28/12)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY SUKHMINDER KAUR BAINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 08/23/2012 OF SUKHMINDER BAINS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CLERK'S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR DISPO/JUDGMENT WAS SET FOR 8/23/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CLERK'S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/03/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less