This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 03:18:58 (UTC).

SUGARMADE VS DIVERSIFIED PRODUCTS

Case Summary

On 10/06/2014 SUGARMADE filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DIVERSIFIED PRODUCTS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0256

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SUGARMADE, INC.

SUGARMADE, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DIVERSIFIED OPPORTUNITIES, INC

SUGARMADE, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JEAN PAUL MARTINET

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DIVERSIFIED PRODUCTS GROUP, INC.

STEPHAN PINTO

LEWIS COHEN

HEIDI ESTIVA

RICHARD GRACER

VICKIE WHALEY

MICHAEL GREEN

DAVID BISTIRLIC

TRUSTEE OF THE MARTINET FAMILYTRUST

DENNIS R PINTO

HENRY MICHON

JEAN PAUL MARTINET

RICK KOLBY

MONICA MCCOMBS

MELBOURNE KIMSEY II

ALICIA PINTO

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

NEMECEK, DAVID P

135 Main Street 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DIETERICH, CHRISTOPHER H

11835 W Olympic Blvd Ste 1235E

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER, RICHARD S

1600 South Main Street Suite 230

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Other Attorneys

POLICAR, RAYMOND A.

Post Office Box 74093

Davis, CA 95617-5093

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT & LIFTING LIEN AGAINST DEFT & CROSS-COMPLAINANT LEWIS COHEN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR APROVE SETTLEMENT NOTWITHSTADNING JDGMNT LIEN FILED BY LEWIS COHEN; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DECLARATION OF RAYMOND A POLICAR FILED RE: IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT NOTWITHSTANDING JUDGMENT LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF RAYMOND A POLICAR, ETC ON SEE LIST FILED; SERVED ON 12/13/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT NOTWITHSTANDING JUDGM FILED BY I.R.B.S. CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. MILLER, ESQ. FILED RE: ISO MTN FOR OST & MTN TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT IN LIG T OF JUDGMENT LIEN S

    Read MoreRead Less
227 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2014
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/04/2014 OF SUGARMADE, INC. AS TO STEPHAN PINTO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/06/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/04/2014 OF SUGARMADE, INC. AS TO LEWIS COHEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/06/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/04/2014 OF SUGARMADE, INC. AS TO HEIDI ESTIVA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/06/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/04/2014 OF SUGARMADE, INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/11/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/24/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.