Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/31/2017 at 03:37:22 (UTC).

STORMS VS. HOME DEPOT

Case Summary

On 05/18/2012 STORMS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HOME DEPOT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1192

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYAN STORMS

Defendant

HOME DEPOT USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OLIVERI, MATTHEW M

1849 Clayton

Concord, CA 94520

Defendant Attorney

CARTWRIGHT, JILL V

Steuart Tower, Suite 1300 One Market Plaza

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL, MAILED ON 06-22-12 TO MATTHEW M OLIVERI3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • CASE REMOVED FROM COURT`S CONTROL DUE TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL HAVING BEEN FILED/ENTERED INTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • CASE IS CLOSED - NO FURTHER ACTION TO BE TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CASE TO US DISTRICT COURT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2012 OF RYAN STORMS FILED BY HOME DEPOT USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/18/2012 OF RYAN STORMS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/05/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 7/23/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant